DC PR22-0593 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Resolution R22-0311 Effective from November 21, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12891
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Resolution R22-0311 Effective from November 21, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12891
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department Of Health Care Finance Independent Procurement Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Department Of Health Care Finance Independent Procurement Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - Council - Amendments 1 thru 3 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - Council - Amendments 1 thru 3 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Council | Resolution R22-0311 Effective from November 21, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12891 |
2017-11-21 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0311 |
2017-11-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-21 | Council | Amendments 1 thru 3 (Gray) |
2017-11-07 | Council | Not considered |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |