DC PR22-0585 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Resolution R22-0405 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1819
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Housing Production Trust Fund Board Lakeeshia A. Fox Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Production Trust Fund Board Lakeeshia A. Fox Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23CouncilResolution R22-0405 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1819
2018-02-06CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0405
2018-02-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-01-31CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-31CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0585
2017-12-08CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-11-03CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0585 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-27CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback