DC PR22-0584 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Resolution R22-0334 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13459
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Resolution R22-0334 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13459
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeland Security And Emergency Management Agency Christopher Rodriguez Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Homeland Security And Emergency Management Agency Christopher Rodriguez Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-29 | Council | Resolution R22-0334 Effective from December 5, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13459 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0334 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0584 |
2017-11-28 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0584 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |