DC PR22-0561 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deemed disapproved 2/14/2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Housing Authority Board Of Commissioners Joshua Lopez Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-01-31CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-31CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0561
2017-12-08CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-10-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0561 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-17CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback