DC PR22-0557 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child Support Guideline Commission Meridel Bulle-vu Appointment Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Guideline Commission Meridel Bulle-vu Appointment Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-12-05CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0557
2017-12-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-11-20CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-11-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0557 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-16CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback