DC PR22-0543 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deemed disapproved 1/24/2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic Preservation Review Board Dr. Sandra Jowers-barber Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0543 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-10-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback