DC PR22-0523 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Resolution R22-0461 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sense Of The Council Arts Humanities In Education Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sense Of The Council Arts Humanities In Education Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27CouncilResolution R22-0461 Effective from April 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4608
2018-04-10CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0461
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-03-15CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-03-13CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0523
2018-01-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0523 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2017-10-03CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback