DC PR22-0495 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 11/18/17
Title
Real Estate Commission Edward K. Downs Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-11-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0495 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-09-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0495 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38845/PR22-0495-Introduction.pdf |