DC PR22-0484 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Resolution R22-0241 Effective from October 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Standard Of Care For Animals Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standard Of Care For Animals Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-13CouncilResolution R22-0241 Effective from October 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10200
2017-10-03CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0241
2017-10-03CouncilFinal Reading
2017-10-03CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-09-28CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback