DC PR22-0429 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deemed approved 10/19/17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation Agreement Between The District Of Columbia Government Department Of Behavioral Health And Committee Of Interns And Residents/service Employees International Union, Ctw, Clc (cir/seiu) Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-13CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0429 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback