DC PR22-0426 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Resolution R22-0231 Effective from September 19, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9474
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Resolution R22-0231 Effective from September 19, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9474
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Council | Resolution R22-0231 Effective from September 19, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9474 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0231 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |