DC PR22-0425 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-10 - Resolution R22-0253 Effective from November 10, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11690
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-10 - Resolution R22-0253 Effective from November 10, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11690
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Judicial Nomination Commission Marie Johns Appointment Resolution Of 2017
Title
District Of Columbia Judicial Nomination Commission Marie Johns Appointment Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-10 | Council | Resolution R22-0253 Effective from November 10, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 11690 |
2017-11-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0253 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0425 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0425 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |