DC PR22-0394 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Resolution R22-0221 Effective from September 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9328
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Resolution R22-0221 Effective from September 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9328
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission On Selection And Tenure Of Administrative Law Judges Of The Administrative Hearings Joseph N. Onek Reappointment Resolution Of 2017
Title
Commission On Selection And Tenure Of Administrative Law Judges Of The Administrative Hearings Joseph N. Onek Reappointment Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Council | Resolution R22-0221 Effective from September 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9328 |
2017-09-22 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0221 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-09-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0394 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-07-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0394 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |