DC PR22-0387 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0197 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0197 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With W.M. Schlosser Company, Inc.
Title
Change Order Nos. 3 Through 7 To Contract No. Dcam-16-cs-0074 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Resolution R22-0197 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7189 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0197 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-06-27 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |