DC PR22-0386 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0196 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0196 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With GCS-Sigal, LLC
Title
Change Order Nos. 4 And 5 To Contract No. Dcam-14-cs-0098 Approval And Payment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Resolution R22-0196 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7187 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0196 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-06-27 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |