DC PR22-0377 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0200 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0200 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Tetra Tech, Inc.
Title
Modification Nos, 6, 7, 8, 9, 13, 14, 15 And 16 To Contract No Cw32705 With Tetra Tech, Inc., Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Resolution R22-0200 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7193 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0200 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-06-27 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |