DC PR22-0368 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Resolution R22-0167 Effective from June 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6750
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Resolution R22-0167 Effective from June 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6750
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Second Amendment To The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Local Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Second Amendment To The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Local Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Council | Resolution R22-0167 Effective from June 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6750 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0167 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-06-27 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |