DC PR22-0359 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0258 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Resolution R22-0258 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin School Surplus Declaration And Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Franklin School Surplus Declaration And Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Council | Resolution R22-0258 Effective from November 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 18 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0258 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-09-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-09-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0359 |
2017-09-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-09-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-06-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0359 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |