DC PR22-0357 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0483 Effective from May 11, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sense Of The Council Supporting Passage Of The Equality Act Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sense Of The Council Supporting Passage Of The Equality Act Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11CouncilResolution R22-0483 Effective from May 11, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5120
2018-05-11CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0483
2018-05-01CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-04-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-04-26CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0357
2017-09-21CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-09-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-06-09CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0357 Published in the DC Register
2017-06-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-06-06CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback