DC PR22-0338 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0185 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0185 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission On The Arts And Humanities Maria Hall Rooney Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Commission On The Arts And Humanities Maria Hall Rooney Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Resolution R22-0185 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7175 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0185 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-07-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0338 |
2017-06-14 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-06-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0338 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |