DC PR22-0313 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0174 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0174 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed disapproved 10/16/17
Title
Office Of Employee Appeals Jelani Freeman Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Resolution R22-0174 Effective from July 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7164 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0174 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-06-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-06-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0313 |
2017-06-22 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0313 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2017-05-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |