DC PR22-0273 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Resolution R22-0155 Effective from June 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Resolution R22-0155 Effective from June 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rent Administrator Lauren Pair Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Rent Administrator Lauren Pair Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Council | Resolution R22-0155 Effective from June 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6735 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0155 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-06-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-06-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0273 |
2017-06-07 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-04-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0273 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |