DC PR22-0263 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolution R22-0108 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolution R22-0108 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
With MCN Build, Inc. for Watkins ES
Title
Change Order Nos. 001 Through 005 To Contract Dcam-16-cs-0032 With Mcn Build, Inc. Approval And Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Council | Resolution R22-0108 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4576 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0108 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0263 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37928/PR22-0263-Introduction.pdf |
Roll Call | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0263 |