DC PR22-0261 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council Reaffirming The District's Commitment To Climate Change Action Resolution Of 2017
Title
Sense Of The Council Reaffirming The District's Commitment To Climate Change Action Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-06-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0261 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0261 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37916/PR22-0261-Introduction.pdf |