DC PR22-0260 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolution R22-0100 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolution R22-0100 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To approve Proposed Multi-Year contract between the District of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and Jubilee-Maycroft Apartments, LP (the "Owner") (CA 22-69).
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2013-lrsp-10a Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Council | Resolution R22-0100 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4564 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0100 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0260 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |