DC PR22-0239 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0145 Effective from June 13, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Resolution R22-0145 Effective from June 13, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2017 Revised Budget Request Adjustment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2017 Revised Budget Request Adjustment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Council | Resolution R22-0145 Effective from June 13, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7158 |
2017-06-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0145 |
2017-06-13 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-06-13 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |