DC PR22-0216 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Resolution R22-0063 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3431
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Resolution R22-0063 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3431
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To approve CA 22-54
Proposed multiyear contract with Biohabitats, Inc. in the amount of $1,581,905.34 to design and install Low Impact Development (LID) Stormwater Retrofit project near the Carter Barron Amphitheater and Tennis Center (Carter Barron) in the District of Columbia.
Title
Multiyear Contract Cw49533 Design And Install Lid Stormwater Retrofits In The Carter Barron Amphitheater And Legg Mason Stadium Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | Council | Resolution R22-0063 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3431 |
2017-04-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0063 |
2017-04-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-04-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |