DC PR22-0190 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Resolution R22-0078 Effective from August 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Resolution R22-0078 Effective from August 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council Supporting The National Mall Underground Parking Feasibility Study Resolution Of 2017
Title
Sense Of The Council Supporting The National Mall Underground Parking Feasibility Study Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | Council | Resolution R22-0078 Effective from August 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7426 |
2017-08-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0078 |
2017-06-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-05-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0190 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-04-07 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-03-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0190 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |