DC PR22-0185 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolution R22-0085 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4549
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolution R22-0085 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4549
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Police Complaints Board Morgan C. Kane Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Police Complaints Board Morgan C. Kane Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Council | Resolution R22-0085 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4549 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0085 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-04-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-04-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0185 |
2017-04-05 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-03-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0185 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |