DC PR22-0130 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Resolution R22-0041 Effective from March 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 2884
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Resolution R22-0041 Effective from March 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 2884
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Pearson VUE
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw40436 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Council | Resolution R22-0041 Effective from March 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 2884 |
2017-03-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0041 |
2017-03-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-02-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |