DC PR22-0114 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-24 - Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0114 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-24 - Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0114 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 4/8/2017
Title
Board Of Dentistry Yolanda Josey-baker Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0114 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-02-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0114 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37438/PR22-0114-Introduction.pdf |