DC PR22-0109 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Resolution R22-0073 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Resolution R22-0073 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission On Arts And Humanities Lawrence Green Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Commission On Arts And Humanities Lawrence Green Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | Council | Resolution R22-0073 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3443 |
2017-04-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0073 |
2017-04-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-03-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-03-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0109 |
2017-03-01 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0109 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-02-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |