DC PR22-0073 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Resolution R22-0239 Effective from October 13, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Opposition To The Revocation Of The Operator Permit (driver License) Or Driving Privilege Of A Person Convicted Of A Drug Offense Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opposition To The Revocation Of The Operator Permit (driver License) Or Driving Privilege Of A Person Convicted Of A Drug Offense Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-13CouncilResolution R22-0239 Effective from October 13, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10198
2017-10-13CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0239
2017-10-03CouncilFinal Reading
2017-09-27CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-09-27CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0073
2017-06-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-05-26CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0073 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-24CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2017-01-23CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback