DC PR22-0062 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Resolution R22-0007 Effective from January 10, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 749
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Resolution R22-0007 Effective from January 10, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 749
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | Council | Resolution R22-0007 Effective from January 10, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 749 |
2017-01-24 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-01-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0007 |
2017-01-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-01-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |