DC PR21-0839 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Resolution R21-0570 Effective from July 12, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9627
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Resolution R21-0570 Effective from July 12, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9627
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Referendum On The State Of New Columbia Admission Act Resolution Of 2016
Title
Advisory Referendum On The State Of New Columbia Admission Act Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Council | Resolution R21-0570 Effective from July 12, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9627 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0570 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0839 Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |