DC PR21-0095 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Resolution R21-0069 Effective from April 14, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 5436
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Resolution R21-0069 Effective from April 14, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 5436
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council On Biophilic Cities Resolution Of 2015
Title
Sense Of The Council On Biophilic Cities Resolution Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Council | Resolution R21-0069 Effective from April 14, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 5436 |
2015-04-14 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0069 |
2015-04-14 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2015-03-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0095 Published in the DC Register |
2015-03-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2015-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |