DC PR20-1113 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Resolution R20-0687 Effective from Nov 18, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Resolution R20-0687 Effective from Nov 18, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2015 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond And General Obligation Bond Issuance Approval Resolution Of 2014
Title
Fiscal Year 2015 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond And General Obligation Bond Issuance Approval Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Council | Resolution R20-0687 Effective from Nov 18, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12738 |
2014-11-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-11-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-1113 |
2014-11-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-1113 |
2014-10-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-1113 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-10-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2014-10-23 | Council | PR20-1113 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |