DC PR20-1104 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Career And Excepted Service Employees Compensation System Changes For Fire Officials Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Career And Excepted Service Employees Compensation System Changes For Fire Officials Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Withdrawn on 11-18-14 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-11-18 - Council - Withdrawn on 11-18-14 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-11-18 | Council | Withdrawn on 11-18-14 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-10-20 | Council | PR20-1104 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |