DC PR20-0918 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0646 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11960
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0646 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11960
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation Review Board Joseph Taylor Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Title
Historic Preservation Review Board Joseph Taylor Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Council | Resolution R20-0646 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11960 |
2014-11-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-28 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0918 |
2014-09-19 | Council | Public Hearing on PR20-0918 |
2014-08-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-14 | Council | Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2014-07-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0918 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-06-25 | Council | PR20-0918 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |