DC PR20-0760 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-10 - Resolution R20-0607 Effective from Sep 23, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 10479
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-10 - Resolution R20-0607 Effective from Sep 23, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 10479
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Director Of The District Department Of Transportation Matthew T. Brown Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Title
Director Of The District Department Of Transportation Matthew T. Brown Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Council - Reconsideration, Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Tabled Time Certain to 9-23-14 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-09-23 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Tabled Time Certain to 9-23-14 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-10 | Council | Resolution R20-0607 Effective from Sep 23, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 10479 |
2014-09-23 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-07-14 | Council | Tabled Time Certain to 9-23-14 Legislative Meeting |
2014-07-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0760 |
2014-06-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0760 |
2014-06-13 | Council | Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0760 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2014-05-02 | Council | PR20-0760 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |