DC CER25-0226 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Resolution ACR25-0224, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Resolution ACR25-0224, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
United States Foreign Service Recognition Resolution of 2024
Title
United States Foreign Service Recognition Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0224, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006813 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0224 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |