DC CER25-0176 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Resolution ACR25-0174, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001866
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Resolution ACR25-0174, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001866
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Girls & Women in Sports Day Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2024
Title
National Girls & Women in Sports Day Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] |
Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0174, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001866 |
2024-02-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0174 |
2024-02-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |