DC CER24-0277 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-25 - Resolution ACR24-0273, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014434
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-25 - Resolution ACR24-0273, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014434
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital One Arena 25th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Capital One Arena 25th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-25 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0273, Effective from Nov 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014434 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0273 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |