DC CER24-0247 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Resolution ACR24-0243, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012287
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Resolution ACR24-0243, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012287
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stephen and Georgene Thompson 50th Anniversary of Player’s Lounge Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Stephen and Georgene Thompson 50th Anniversary of Player’s Lounge Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - RECONSIDERED - ALL PRESENT (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0243, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012287 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0243 |
2022-09-20 | Council | RECONSIDERED - ALL PRESENT |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |