DC CER24-0237 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Resolution ACR24-0233, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Resolution ACR24-0233, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hispanic Heritage Month Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Hispanic Heritage Month Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - RECONSIDERED - ALL PRESENT (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0233, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012267 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0233 |
2022-09-20 | Council | RECONSIDERED - ALL PRESENT |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |