DC CER24-0210 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution ACR24-0206, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008948
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution ACR24-0206, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008948
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Greater Washington Hispanic Chamber of Commerce and Equality Chamber of Commerce Partnership Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Greater Washington Hispanic Chamber of Commerce and Equality Chamber of Commerce Partnership Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0206, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008948 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0206 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |