DC CER24-0206 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution ACR24-0202, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008941
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Resolution ACR24-0202, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008941
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Backyard Band Ceremonial Resolution of 2022
Title
Backyard Band Ceremonial Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0202, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 008941 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0202 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |