DC CER24-0175 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0172, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006317
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0172, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006317
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Old People Are Cool Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
The Old People Are Cool Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0172, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006317 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0172 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-05-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-04-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |