DC CER24-0160 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0157, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0157, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sidwell Friends School Girls Basketball DCSAA Class AA Championship Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Sidwell Friends School Girls Basketball DCSAA Class AA Championship Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0157, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006286 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0157 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-04-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |