DC CER24-0153 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0150, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006273
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Resolution ACR24-0150, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006273
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Friendship Technology Preparatory High School Public Charter School Athletic Association Class AA High School Basketball Championship Ceremonial Resolution of 2022
Title
Friendship Technology Preparatory High School Public Charter School Athletic Association Class AA High School Basketball Championship Ceremonial Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0150, Effective from Apr 05, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 006273 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0150 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-04-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |